Global Patent Index - EP 0980333 A1

EP 0980333 A1 2000-02-23 - BAG SUSPENDING DEVICE

Title (en)

BAG SUSPENDING DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFHÄNGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERPACKUNGSBEUTEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SUSPENSION DE SACHET

Publication

EP 0980333 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98922909 A

Priority

  • FR 9800877 W
  • FR 9705495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762828A1] The invention concerns the field of bags provided with a suspending device which can be recycled by the same method as the bag, and enabling automatic assembly. The suspending device is characterised in that it is formed by an integral plastic piece, with a suspending part (1) designed to suspend the bag, formed by a loop, and a fixing part (6), designed to attach the suspending part (1) to the bag, formed by an element cast en bloc with the loop adapted to pass through the bag and be maintained thereon. The fixing part (6) shaft (8) is maintained in the holes bored in the bag walls by swaging the fixing part (6) end (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850277A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762828 A1 19981106; FR 2762828 B1 19990806; DE 69822811 D1 20040506; DE 69822811 T2 20050203; EP 0980333 A1 20000223; EP 0980333 B1 20040331; US 6213640 B1 20010410; WO 9850277 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090416

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69822811

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB