Global Patent Index - EP 0980334 A2

EP 0980334 A2 2000-02-23 - FLEXIBLE, COLLAPSIBLE, SELF-SUPPORTING STORAGE BAGS AND CONTAINERS

Title (en)

FLEXIBLE, COLLAPSIBLE, SELF-SUPPORTING STORAGE BAGS AND CONTAINERS

Title (de)

FLEXIBLE ZUSAMMENLEGBARE SELBSTTRAGENDE BEUTEL UND BEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

SACS ET RECIPIENTS DE CONSERVATION AUTOPORTEURS, COMPRESSIBLES ET SOUPLES

Publication

EP 0980334 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98923342 A

Priority

  • US 9809216 W
  • US 85377397 A
  • US 85424697 A
  • US 85424797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850279A2] The present invention provides a flexible storage bag (10) comprising at least one sheet of flexible sheet material assembled to form a semi-enclosed container having an opening defined by a hinged peripheral flange (31). The hinged flange includes a closure means for sealing the opening to convert the semi-enclosed container to a closed container. When the bottom is placed on a horizontal surface the container is self-supporting and maintains the opening in an open condition. The present invention also provides a collapsible, stackable, self-restorable container (101) comprising a unitary continuous tubular side wall having a first open end and a second open end defining an axial direction extending through the first and second open ends. The tubular sidewall is collapsible in response to an externally-applied force exerted in its axial direction and is self-restorable when the force is removed. A lid (401) attached to the tubular side wall for selectively converting the semi-enclosed container to a closed container completes the storage container, and a closure means is provided for sealing the lid to the tubular sidewall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/16; B65D 77/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/24 (2006.01); B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 33/18 (2006.01); B65D 77/20 (2006.01); B65D 77/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/20 (2013.01); B65D 33/1658 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850279A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850279 A2 19981112; WO 9850279 A3 19990225; AU 737264 B2 20010816; AU 7565398 A 19981127; BR 9808757 A 20001003; CA 2289669 A1 19981112; CA 2289669 C 20051220; CN 1080687 C 20020313; CN 1261320 A 20000726; CO 4790163 A1 19990531; DE 69807061 D1 20020912; DE 69807061 T2 20030227; EP 0980334 A2 20000223; EP 0980334 B1 20020807; ES 2178212 T3 20021216; HK 1027075 A1 20030411; JP 2000512960 A 20001003; JP 3388762 B2 20030324; KR 100354924 B1 20021005; KR 20010012315 A 20010215; PE 34099 A1 19990423; TW 431991 B 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69807061

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120506

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110511

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110428

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040507

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-06-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030617

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030605

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030506

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178212

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69807061

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE