Global Patent Index - EP 0980336 A1

EP 0980336 A1 2000-02-23 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BLOCKING A STACK OF STACKED OBJECTS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR BLOCKING A STACK OF STACKED OBJECTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM VERBLOCKEN EINES STAPELS VON GESTAPELTEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR BLOQUER UNE PILE D'OBJETS

Publication

EP 0980336 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924311 A

Priority

  • DE 19719935 A
  • EP 9802838 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719935A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for blocking a stack (21) of stacked objects such as stacked newspapers, magazines or such like. Said device comprises a pressing unit having two press elements (13, 14, 8) situated opposite each other between which a stack (21) can be pressed, and charging electrodes for applying an electric voltage for charging the stack (21). According to the invention, the charging electrodes (15, 16; 8) are integrated only into the press elements situated opposite each other so that when the stack (21) is pressed, said electrodes are pressed against the stack. In this manner, using a very simply designed device for blocking a stack, the voltage applied is introduced in a highly effective manner into the stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/26 (2006.01); B65H 31/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/34 (2013.01); B65H 2301/422 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4223 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5132 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5322 (2013.01); Y10S 414/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851602A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719935 A1 19981119; AT 210595 T 20011215; DK 0980336 T3 20020211; EP 0980336 A1 20000223; EP 0980336 B1 20011212; ES 2169521 T3 20020701; JP 2001507321 A 20010605; JP 3408259 B2 20030519; US 6748855 B1 20040615; WO 9851602 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802446

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100514

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100513

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-09-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Free text: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GESELLSCHAFT MBH#NEUDORFER STRASSE 5#D-79576 WEIL AM RHEIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GESELLSCHAFT MBH#NEUDORFER STRASSE 5#D-79576 WEIL AM RHEIN (DE)

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080513

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080513

2009-01-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080407

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: MANFRED SAEGER;POSTFACH 5;7304 MAIENFELD (CH)

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: WEITERBEHANDLUNG GUTGEHEISSEN

2006-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SAEGER & PARTNER

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050513

2004-06-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169521 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802446 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210595 T 20011215

2000-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR BLOCKING A STACK OF STACKED OBJECTS

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990922

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE