Global Patent Index - EP 0980336 B1

EP 0980336 B1 2001-12-12 - DEVICE FOR BLOCKING A STACK OF STACKED OBJECTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR BLOCKING A STACK OF STACKED OBJECTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBLOCKEN EINES STAPELS VON GESTAPELTEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

DIPOSITIF POUR BLOQUER UNE PILE D'OBJETs

Publication

EP 0980336 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924311 A

Priority

  • DE 19719935 A
  • EP 9802838 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719935A1] The invention relates to a device and a method for blocking a stack (21) of stacked objects such as stacked newspapers, magazines or such like. Said device comprises a pressing unit having two press elements (13, 14, 8) situated opposite each other between which a stack (21) can be pressed, and charging electrodes for applying an electric voltage for charging the stack (21). According to the invention, the charging electrodes (15, 16; 8) are integrated only into the press elements situated opposite each other so that when the stack (21) is pressed, said electrodes are pressed against the stack. In this manner, using a very simply designed device for blocking a stack, the voltage applied is introduced in a highly effective manner into the stack.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/26 (2006.01); B65H 31/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/34 (2013.01); B65H 2301/422 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4223 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5132 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5322 (2013.01); Y10S 414/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719935 A1 19981119; AT 210595 T 20011215; DK 0980336 T3 20020211; EP 0980336 A1 20000223; EP 0980336 B1 20011212; ES 2169521 T3 20020701; JP 2001507321 A 20010605; JP 3408259 B2 20030519; US 6748855 B1 20040615; WO 9851602 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802446

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100514

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100513

2011-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-12-08 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-09-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Free text: ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GESELLSCHAFT MBH#NEUDORFER STRASSE 5#D-79576 WEIL AM RHEIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK GESELLSCHAFT MBH#NEUDORFER STRASSE 5#D-79576 WEIL AM RHEIN (DE)

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080513

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080513

2009-01-12 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080407

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: MANFRED SAEGER;POSTFACH 5;7304 MAIENFELD (CH)

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-02-28 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: WEITERBEHANDLUNG GUTGEHEISSEN

2006-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SAEGER & PARTNER

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ELTEX-ELEKTROSTATIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050513

2004-06-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040421

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169521 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-02-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802446 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210595 T 20011215

2000-11-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR BLOCKING A STACK OF STACKED OBJECTS

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990922

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE