Global Patent Index - EP 0980347 A1

EP 0980347 A1 2000-02-23 - SEPARATION OF CO 2? FROM UNSATURATED FLUORINATED COMPOUNDS BY SEMIPERMEABLE MEMBRANE

Title (en)

SEPARATION OF CO 2? FROM UNSATURATED FLUORINATED COMPOUNDS BY SEMIPERMEABLE MEMBRANE

Title (de)

TRENNUNG VON CO2 VON UNGESÄTTIGTEN FLUORIERTEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN DURCH SEMIPERMEABLE MEMBRANE

Title (fr)

EXTRACTION DE CO 2? DANS LES COMPOSES FLUORES INSATURES PAR MEMBRANE SEMIPERMEABLE

Publication

EP 0980347 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918919 A

Priority

  • US 9808922 W
  • US 4544097 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850332A1] A process for separating carbon dioxide from an unsaturated fluorinated compound carbon dioxide mixture comprising contacting the unsaturated fluorinated compound carbon dioxide mixture with a semipermeable membrane to form at least one exit stream having an increased concentration of carbon dioxide and at least one other exit stream having a reduced concentration of carbon dioxide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 17/38; B01D 53/22; C07C 21/18; C07C 41/34; C07C 43/17

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/22 (2006.01); B01D 71/64 (2006.01); B01D 71/82 (2006.01); C07C 17/38 (2006.01); C07C 21/18 (2006.01); C07C 21/185 (2006.01); C07C 41/36 (2006.01); C07C 43/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/228 (2013.01); B01D 53/226 (2013.01); C07C 17/38 (2013.01); C07C 41/36 (2013.01); Y02C 10/10 (2013.01); Y02P 20/152 (2015.11)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 17/38 + C07C 19/08
  2. C07C 41/36 + C07C 43/17

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850332A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850332 A1 19981112; CN 1150143 C 20040519; CN 1253540 A 20000517; DE 69823184 D1 20040519; DE 69823184 T2 20050421; EP 0980347 A1 20000223; EP 0980347 B1 20040414; JP 2001527553 A 20011225; JP 2008088190 A 20080417; US 6123749 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69823184

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150602

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823184 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: O'BRIEN, WILLIAM, G.

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOELKE, CHARLES, J.

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARKER, RAYMOND, C.

2003-10-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VAN BRAMER, DAVID JOHN

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991004

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL