Global Patent Index - EP 0980350 A2

EP 0980350 A2 2000-02-23 - HYDROXYNAPHTHOIC ACIDS AND DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

HYDROXYNAPHTHOIC ACIDS AND DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

ASYMMETRISCHE SYNTHESE VON BENZOXAZINOEN ÜBER NEUE ZWISCHENPRODUKTE

Title (fr)

ACIDES HYDROXYNAPHTOIQUES ET DERIVES DE CES DERNIERS

Publication

EP 0980350 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98918831 A

Priority

  • US 9808544 W
  • US 4508397 P
  • US 98847297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849130A2] In one embodiment, the present invention provides a compound comprising formula (I), wherein A = H or OH, X = OH, a halogen, OR, NHR, NR', R'' where R, R', and R'' = H, C1-8alkyl, C2-8alkenyl, or C2-8alkynyl, cycloalkyl, cycloalkenyl, aryl, aralkyl or heterocyclic, substituted or unsubstituted; and R1,R2,R3,R4,R5 = H, C1-8alkyl, C2-8alkenyl, or C2-8alkynyl, cycloalkyl, cycloalkenyl, aryl or heterocyclic, substituted or unsubstituted, wherein R1 includes at least one methylene spacer through which R1 is attached to said compound. The present invention also provides methods for making hydroxynaphthoic acids.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 69/76; C07C 63/34; C07C 233/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 51/29 (2006.01); C07C 51/377 (2006.01); C07C 65/11 (2006.01); C07C 67/343 (2006.01); C07C 235/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 235/66 (2013.01); C07C 51/29 (2013.01); C07C 51/377 (2013.01); C07C 65/11 (2013.01); C07C 67/343 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 51/29 + C07C 65/24
  2. C07C 51/29 + C07C 63/36
  3. C07C 51/377 + C07C 65/11
  4. C07C 67/343 + C07C 69/734

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849130 A2 19981105; WO 9849130 A3 19990128; CA 2288199 A1 19981105; EP 0980350 A2 20000223; EP 0980350 A4 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030623

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION UNM

2003-01-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021112

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07C 69/94 A, 7C 07C 63/34 B, 7C 07C 235/66 B, 7C 07C 65/11 B, 7C 07C 51/377 B, 7C 07C 51/29 B

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991104

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE