Global Patent Index - EP 0980390 A2

EP 0980390 A2 2000-02-23 - HUMAN-CD28 SPECIFIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES FOR ANTIGEN NON-SPECIFIC ACTIVATION OF T-LYMPHOCYTES

Title (en)

HUMAN-CD28 SPECIFIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES FOR ANTIGEN NON-SPECIFIC ACTIVATION OF T-LYMPHOCYTES

Title (de)

HUMAN-CD28 SPEZIFISCHE MONOKLONALE ANTIKÖRPER ZUR ANTIGENUNSPEZIFISCHEN AKTIVIERUNG VON T-LYMPHOZYTEN

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX SPECIFIQUES DE LA MOLECULE CD28 HUMAINE POUR ACTIVATION DE CELLULES T DE MANIERE NON SPECIFIQUE DE L'ANTIGENE

Publication

EP 0980390 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98934848 A

Priority

  • DE 9801499 W
  • DE 19722888 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722888A1] The invention relates to human-compatible monoclonal antibodies, which are specific against human-CD28 and which activate non-specifically human-T-lymphocytes of several to all sub-groups without occupying an antigen receptor of said human-T-lymphocytes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 16/28; C12N 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 5/18 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/91 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/2818 (2013.01); C07K 14/70521 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2317/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854225A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722888 A1 19981203; AU 8432498 A 19981230; EP 0980390 A2 20000223; JP 2002502244 A 20020122; US 2006039909 A1 20060223; US 2011009602 A1 20110113; US 6987171 B1 20060117; US 8334102 B2 20121218; WO 9854225 A2 19981203; WO 9854225 A3 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-08 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20140820

2014-08-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-11-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THERAMAB LLC

2009-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THERAMAB GMBH

2008-12-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARCHEM SERVICE COMPANY LIMITED

2006-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUENIG, THOMAS C/O TEGENERO AG

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEGENERO AG

2003-07-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUENIG, THOMAS

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEGENERO GMBH

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TEGENERO GMBH

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991126;LT PAYMENT 19991126;LV PAYMENT 19991126;MK PAYMENT 19991126;RO PAYMENT 19991126;SI PAYMENT 19991126