Global Patent Index - EP 0980416 A2

EP 0980416 A2 2000-02-23 - POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS AS LUBRICANTS FOR CO 2?-BASED REFRIGERATING MACHINES

Title (en)

POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS AS LUBRICANTS FOR CO 2?-BASED REFRIGERATING MACHINES

Title (de)

POLYALKYLENGLYKOLE ALS SCHMIERMITTEL FÜR CO 2?-KÄLTEMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

POLYALKYLENE GLYCOLS COMME LUBRIFIANT DE MACHINES FRIGORIFIQUES AU CO 2?

Publication

EP 0980416 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98932037 A

Priority

  • DE 9801196 W
  • DE 19719132 A
  • DE 19719430 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850499A2] Disclosed are fuel compounds containing lubricant based on polyalkylene-glycols, which are suitable for lubricating refrigerating machines, heat pumps and related equipment, for which the fuel required is carbon dioxide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 107/34; C10M 111/04; C10M 171/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 105/38 (2006.01); C10M 107/34 (2006.01); C10M 111/04 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 107/34 (2013.01); C10M 105/38 (2013.01); C10M 111/04 (2013.01); C10M 171/008 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1033 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1055 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1075 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2209/109 (2013.01); C10M 2209/1095 (2013.01); C10N 2220/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 111/04 + C10M 105/38 + C10M 107/34

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850499A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850499 A2 19981112; WO 9850499 A3 19990204; AR 012666 A1 20001108; AU 8208998 A 19981127; DE 19880588 D2 20000413; DE 59808991 D1 20030814; DK 0980416 T3 20031020; DK 0980416 T4 20091012; EP 0980416 A2 20000223; EP 0980416 B1 20030709; EP 0980416 B2 20090610

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170411

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-12 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2009-06-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2005-12-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

2005-01-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: COGNIS PERFORMANCE CHEMICALS UK LIMITED

- Effective date: 20040407

2005-01-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IDEMITSU KOSAN CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COGNIS PERFORMANCE CHEMICALS UK LIMITED

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-06-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: IDEMITSU KOSAN CO. LTD

- Effective date: 20040413

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808991 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010720

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT