Global patent index - EP 0980436 A1

EP 0980436 A1 2000-02-23 - INCREASED PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS BY USING CHAPERONE-LIKE PROTEINS

Title (en)

INCREASED PRODUCTION OF PROTEINS BY USING CHAPERONE-LIKE PROTEINS

Title (de)

ERHÖHTE PRODUKTION VON PROTEINEN DURCH VERWENDUNG VON CHAPERONPROTEINEN

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION ACCRUE DE PROTEINES AU MOYEN DE PROTEINES DU TYPE CHAPERONE

Publication

EP 0980436 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928658 A

Priority

  • EP 98928658 A
  • EP 97201790 A
  • NL 9800335 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856928A1] The invention relates to the production of recombinant proteins that are expressed in heterologous host cells and to methods to increase production levels of these proteins by the use of a chaperon-like protein. Producing or isolating a protein or polypeptide in large amounts and in a relatively pure form from its original (homologous) host or host cell where it is expressed is cumbersome and often economically unattractive. However, the development of recombinant DNA methodology has opened the possibility to produce proteins by expression, e.g. in a heterologous host or host cell. A wide and still expanding array of foreign polypeptides or proteins can now be produced or expressed in heterologous expression systems. The invention provides a method to express a polypeptide encoded by a nucleic acid sequence present in a host cell which host cell additionally comprises a chaperone-like protein capable of specific binding with said polypeptide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/62; C07K 19/00; C12P 21/02; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74; C12N 15/81; C12N 15/80; C12N 1/21; C12N 1/15; C12N 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/16 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 9/64 (2006.01); C12N 15/62 (2006.01); C12N 15/67 (2006.01); C12N 15/70 (2006.01); C12N 15/74 (2006.01); C12N 15/80 (2006.01); C12N 15/81 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/6483 (2013.01); C07K 16/40 (2013.01); C12N 15/625 (2013.01); C12N 15/67 (2013.01); C12N 15/81 (2013.01); C12P 21/02 (2013.01); C12Y 304/23004 (2013.01); C07K 2319/035 (2013.01); C07K 2319/04 (2013.01); C07K 2319/21 (2013.01); C07K 2319/35 (2013.01); C07K 2319/41 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856928 A1 19981217; AU 8040798 A 19981230; EP 0980436 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2004-10-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031113

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL