Global Patent Index - EP 0980447 A1

EP 0980447 A1 2000-02-23 - FILLING YARN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING IT FROM THERMALLY PROTECTED POLYAMIDE 6.6 FOR TYRE CORD FABRIC

Title (en)

FILLING YARN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING IT FROM THERMALLY PROTECTED POLYAMIDE 6.6 FOR TYRE CORD FABRIC

Title (de)

SCHUSSGARN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHUSSGARNS AUS EINEM WÄRMEGESCHÜTZTEN POLYAMID 66 FÜR REIFENKORDGEWEBE

Title (fr)

FIL DE TRAME ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN FIL DE TRAME A PARTIR D'UN POLYAMIDE 6.6 THERMOPROTEGE POUR TISSU POUR CABLE POUR PNEU

Publication

EP 0980447 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98914768 A

Priority

  • CH 9800170 W
  • CH 106097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850612A1] The invention relates to a filling yarn made of a thermally protected polyamide 6.6 multifilament for tyre cord fabric with a total titer of 100-400 dtex. This filling yarn is also raw yarn, and is characterized by: a SLASE of 6 cN/tex to 12 cN/tex at 80 % elongation; a maximum tensile stress strain of 150 % to 300 %; a strength of > 14 cN/tex; a reversibility limit of 5 cN/tex to 10 cN/tex; a thermal shrinkage force of 0.15 cN/tex to 0.8 cN/tex at 160 DEG C; free shrinkage > 1 % at 160 DEG C. The invention also relates to a method for producing a filling yarn from thermally protected polyamide 6.6 multifilament for tyre cord fabric. In this method, polyamide LOY filaments are stretched between 10 and 200 % before being swirled at least 10 knots/m by a compressed gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 1/16; D02G 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/00 (2006.01); D02G 1/16 (2006.01); D02G 3/48 (2006.01); D03D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 1/168 (2013.01); D02G 3/48 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249921 (2015.04); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2924 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2969 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850612A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850612 A1 19981112; AR 012654 A1 20001108; AT 215137 T 20020415; BR 9809597 A 20000704; CN 1091178 C 20020918; CN 1255171 A 20000531; CZ 297623 B6 20070214; CZ 9903921 A3 20000315; DE 59803519 D1 20020502; EA 001120 B1 20001030; EA 199901003 A1 20000626; EP 0980447 A1 20000223; EP 0980447 B1 20020327; ES 2175700 T3 20021116; ID 22691 A 19991209; JP 2001507411 A 20010605; JP 3459266 B2 20031020; TR 9902697 T2 20000721; TW 393533 B 20000611; US 6156426 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130428

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130429

2014-06-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140611

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130428

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803519

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130428

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130428

2013-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 215137 T

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-11-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-11-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131101

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA INDUSTRIAL YARNS A.G.

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120314

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120412

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120502

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20120504

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120413

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120412

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175700 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803519 20020502

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215137 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHODIA INDUSTRIAL YARNS AG

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL