Global Patent Index - EP 0980449 A1

EP 0980449 A1 2000-02-23 - TREATMENT OF FIBROUS SUBSTRATES TO IMPART REPELLENCY, STAIN RESISTANCE, AND SOIL RESISTANCE

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF FIBROUS SUBSTRATES TO IMPART REPELLENCY, STAIN RESISTANCE, AND SOIL RESISTANCE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ÖL- UND WASSERABWEISENDMACHEN UND ZUR FLECKENABWEISENDEN AUSRÜSTUNG VON FASERMATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE SUBSTRATS FIBREUX VISANT A LEUR CONFERER DES PROPRIETES HYDROFUGES, ANTI-TACHES ET ANTI-SALISSURES

Publication

EP 0980449 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918639 A

Priority

  • US 9808211 W
  • US 4558497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850619A1] A process is described which imparts exceptional antisoiling, anti-staining and repellent properties to carpets. The process makes use of a water-based exhaustion process wherein the water-based treating solution contains (1) glassy fluorochemical material, glassy hydrocarbon material, or combinations thereof; (2) a stainblocking material; (3) a polyvalent metal salt, acid, or combinations thereof; and (4) water. Subsequent to exhaustion, the wet treated carpet is heated, usually in a steaming step, rinsed, and dried in a dry heat oven.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/277; D06M 13/425; D06M 15/21; D06M 15/437; D06M 15/55; D06M 15/576

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/263 (2006.01); D06M 15/277 (2006.01); D06M 15/41 (2006.01); D06M 15/437 (2006.01); D06M 15/576 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/576 (2013.01); D06M 15/263 (2013.01); D06M 15/277 (2013.01); D06M 15/412 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850619A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850619 A1 19981112; AU 7152698 A 19981127; AU 736286 B2 20010726; BR 9808724 A 20000711; CA 2287494 A1 19981112; CA 2287494 C 20111101; CN 1141439 C 20040310; CN 1255173 A 20000531; EP 0980449 A1 20000223; EP 0980449 B1 20110525; JP 2001526739 A 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69842287

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140420

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140420

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140414

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130417

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69842287

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120228

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110525

2011-09-21 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110525

2011-07-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69842287

- Effective date: 20110707

2011-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2011-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020624

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL