Global Patent Index - EP 0980460 A1

EP 0980460 A1 2000-02-23 - WINDOW/DOOR FOR A BUILDING

Title (en)

WINDOW/DOOR FOR A BUILDING

Title (de)

FENSTER/TÜR FÜR EIN GEBÄUDE

Title (fr)

FENETRE OU PORTE POUR BATIMENT

Publication

EP 0980460 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925551 A

Priority

  • DE 19719231 A
  • EP 9802683 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719231A1] The invention relates to a window/door for a building having a burglar alarm (11, 111) fitted between the window frame/door frame (1) and the window casement/door leaf (2) which emits an alarm signal. The invention is characterized in that the burglar alarm has a detection zone along the beams of frame, by means of which the penetration of a break-in tool (10) into the first partition line (9) between the window/door frame and the window casement/door leaf is turned into an alarm signal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/11 (2006.01); G08B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/06 (2013.01); E06B 5/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850666A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719231 A1 19981119; DE 19719231 B4 20130711; AT 277264 T 20041015; EP 0980460 A1 20000223; EP 0980460 B1 20040922; PL 336522 A1 20000703; WO 9850666 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812001

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140507

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 277264 T

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2014-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PAX A.G.

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120507

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120507

2012-12-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120210

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812001

- Representative's name: JOCHEN MUELLER, DE

2012-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812001

- Representative's name: MUELLER, JOCHEN, DIPL.-ING., DE

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110601

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110504

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PAX AG

- Free text: PAX AG#NEUWEG 7#55218 INGELHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- PAX AG#NEUWEG 7#55218 INGELHEIM (DE)

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812001 P 20041028

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PAX AG

2001-07-25 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-07-25 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20011116

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991002

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL