Global Patent Index - EP 0980472 A1

EP 0980472 A1 2000-02-23 - DISCHARGING BY-PASS FOR HIGH PRESSURE DIRECT INJECTION PUMP

Title (en)

DISCHARGING BY-PASS FOR HIGH PRESSURE DIRECT INJECTION PUMP

Title (de)

ENTLASTUNGS-BYPASS FÜR HOCHDRUCKPUMPE MIT DIREKTEINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

BY-PASS DE DELESTAGE POUR POMPE A INJECTION DIRECTE A HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0980472 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98924389 A

Priority

  • FR 9800911 W
  • FR 9705724 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763100A1] The invention concerns a discharging device for a high pressure direct injection pump (10) supplying fuel to a motor vehicle engine injector ramp (6), the pump (10) being supplied with fuel by a low pressure electric supercharging pump (11) communicating with a fuel tank (14) and the high pressure delivered being regulated by a pressure regulator (9), said pressure regulator (9) operating as a three-way valve supplying fuel, below a predetermined threshold of the engine rotation speed, to the ramp (6) by the supercharging pump (11), then supplying said ramp (6) through the injection pump (10) top part when the engine speed is above the predetermined threshold.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02M 55/00; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/32 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2013.01); F02D 41/32 (2013.01); F02D 41/3809 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851921A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763100 A1 19981113; FR 2763100 B1 19990723; BR 9809607 A 20000704; DE 69804602 D1 20020508; DE 69804602 T2 20040219; EP 0980472 A1 20000223; EP 0980472 B1 20020403; US 6170473 B1 20010109; WO 9851921 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804602 20020508

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PONTOPPIDAN, MICHAEL

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010726

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991104

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT