Global patent index - EP 0980473 A1

EP 0980473 A1 2000-02-23 - DELIVERY UNIT

Title (en)

DELIVERY UNIT

Title (de)

FÖRDEREINHEIT

Title (fr)

UNITE DE REFOULEMENT

Publication

EP 0980473 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924156 A

Priority

  • DE 19718792 A
  • EP 9802336 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19718792A1] The invention relates to a delivery unit (1) which is assembled in the fuel tank of an automobile, comprising a pump (3) with a wall (7) and a filter element (4) which is prestressed against the wall (7) of the pump. The housing (5) of the delivery unit (1) is manufactured as a single piece with a clamping element (18). The clamping element (18) has a flanged border (20) which clamps one edge (19) of the filter element (4) from behind. This enables the delivery unit (1) to be produced at a particularly low cost.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/08; F02M 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/08 (2006.01); F02M 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/08 (2013.01); F02M 37/22 (2013.01); F02M 2037/225 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850695A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19718792 A1 19981105; BR 9809428 A 20000613; EP 0980473 A1 20000223; EP 0980473 B1 20030625; ES 2202862 T3 20040401; US 6423221 B1 20020723; WO 9850695 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070423

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070423

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070421

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070421

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-05-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2202862

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010906

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991027

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB