Global Patent Index - EP 0980496 A1

EP 0980496 A1 2000-02-23 - CONTINUOUS STEAM GENERATOR

Title (en)

CONTINUOUS STEAM GENERATOR

Title (de)

DURCHLAUFDAMPFERZEUGER IN ZWEIZUGBAUART

Title (fr)

GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR CONTINU

Publication

EP 0980496 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932012 A

Priority

  • DE 9801167 W
  • DE 19719724 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851964A1] Disclosed is a continuous two-feed steam generator comprised of a first vertical feed gas pipe (4) with an gas up-flow hot gas tube. The inventive apparatus is characterized in that the back wall (7) of the combustion chamber is inclined inwards to form, together with the bottom (12) of the immediately contiguous horizontal feed gas pipe, a nose engaging into the combustion chamber (8). Some manifolds (9C) in the lower part (14) of the steam generator rear wall extend upwards with no inclination owing to their support function, up to a support structure (5) located outside the hot gas pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 29/06 (2006.01); F22B 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 29/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851964A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851964 A1 19981119; CA 2288676 A1 19981119; CA 2288676 C 20070213; CN 1112536 C 20030625; CN 1254408 A 20000524; DK 0980496 T3 20021014; EP 0980496 A1 20000223; EP 0980496 B1 20020626; ES 2179516 T3 20030116; JP 2001525050 A 20011204; JP 3899132 B2 20070328; KR 100444497 B1 20040816; US 6651596 B1 20031125

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130427

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030428

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030428

2003-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030428

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179516 T3

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804591 20020801

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE