Global Patent Index - EP 0980498 A1

EP 0980498 A1 2000-02-23 - ATTIC VENT

Title (en)

ATTIC VENT

Title (de)

DACHLÜFTER

Title (fr)

EVENT ATTIQUE

Publication

EP 0980498 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911049 A

Priority

  • US 9904578 W
  • US 3473698 A
  • US 3473798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945327A1] The present invention provides a ventilation system for an attic or rafter space that mimics the appearance of the roofing material and thus has little effect on the appearance of the building. The vent (40) has two pieces, a primary vent (12) and a secondary vent (40) and they may be made of aluminum, galvanized steel or copper. The primary vent (12) is installed on a roof deck over a ventilation opening cut through the deck. The secondary vent is constructed to look like the surrounding field tiles (21) and is installed over the primary vent (40). One or more vent openings (36) in the secondary vent (12) and an opening in the primary vent conduct (40) conduct air between the attic or rafter space and the outside. The secondary vent (12) has a skeleton (16) with one or more vent openings (36) and a cap (14) covering each opening shielding the ventilating space. Skeletons (16) are formed in one piece and are made to fit each different size and type of roofing tile. The caps (14) and the skeleton (16) are ribbed for rigidity. The caps (14) are made in one size only to minimize manufacturing and inventory complexity, thus any cap may be fitted on any skeleton (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 7/02; E04D 1/30; E04D 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/30 (2006.01); E04D 13/17 (2006.01); F24F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/17 (2013.01); E04D 1/30 (2013.01); F24F 7/02 (2013.01); E04D 2001/302 (2013.01); E04D 2001/309 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945327A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945327 A1 19990910; AU 2978599 A 19990920; DE 69922597 D1 20050120; DE 69922597 T2 20051208; EP 0980498 A1 20000223; EP 0980498 B1 20041215; ES 2234244 T3 20050616

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69922597

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234244 T3

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922597 P 20050120

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020402

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES