Global Patent Index - EP 0980504 A1

EP 0980504 A1 2000-02-23 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE RADIATOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE AGAINST PROJECTED PARTICLES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PROTECTING THE RADIATOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE AGAINST PROJECTED PARTICLES

Title (de)

SCHUTZEINRICHTUNG GEGEN AUFTREFFENDE PARTIKEL FÜR EINEN KÜHLER IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DU RADIATEUR D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR CONTRE L'IMPACT DE PARTICULES

Publication

EP 0980504 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925538 A

Priority

  • DE 19719021 A
  • EP 9802653 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850751A1] A device is disclosed for protecting the radiator (1) of a motor vehicle against projected particles. The radiator (1) has spaced apart ribbed pipes (2 to 6) for conveying the cooling medium. According to the invention, the ribbed pipe walls, which in the assembled state of the radiator (1) are oriented in the direction of projected particles (arrow 19) and mechanically stressed, are only protected against particle blows by a plating which directly covers them and is mechanically joined thereto without any gap. This plating is preferably a mere material thickening (18) of the ribbed pipes, a bead (21) of elastic material applied on the ribbed pipes and/or a covering strip (23) clipped on the ribbed pipes, several covering strips (23) being appropriately designed as a grid (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 19/00; B60K 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 11/04 (2006.01); F28F 19/00 (2006.01); F28F 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 19/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850751A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850751 A1 19981112; AT 224527 T 20021015; BR 9809603 A 20000704; EP 0980504 A1 20000223; EP 0980504 B1 20020918; JP 2001527634 A 20011225; KR 20010012282 A 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805617

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805617 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224527 T 20021015

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RADIATOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A PROTECTION DEVICE AGAINST PROJECTED PARTICLES

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-11-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: RADIATOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A PROTECTION DEVICE AGAINST PROJECTED PARTICLES

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991207

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE