Global Patent Index - EP 0980543 A1

EP 0980543 A1 2000-02-23 - METHOD FOR MAKING A WATCH CASE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING A WATCH CASE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES UHRENGEHÄUSES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE BOITE DE MONTRE

Publication

EP 0980543 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904678 A

Priority

  • CH 9900092 W
  • CH 47198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0939351A1] The molded ring fills all space remaining between watch ring and casing. The watch comprises a casing (2) and a surrounding circle (3) with a base (7). This encloses the movement (4) with an adjusting shaft (10). A circular sealing ring (12) surrounds the adjusting shaft, which extends to a recess which is formed in the outside of the casing to receive the watch adjuster. Elastomer material (9) is molded in position within the casing, filling the entire space between the surrounding circuit and the casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04D 3/00; G04B 37/04; G04B 37/08; G04B 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 37/05 (2006.01); G04B 37/08 (2006.01); G04B 37/22 (2006.01); G04D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04D 3/0061 (2013.01); G04B 37/055 (2013.01); G04B 37/081 (2013.01); G04B 37/221 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944104A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0939351 A1 19990901; CH 693049 A5 20030131; CN 1122897 C 20031001; CN 1256765 A 20000614; DE 69921914 D1 20041223; DE 69921914 T2 20060302; EP 0980543 A1 20000223; EP 0980543 B1 20041117; ES 2234239 T3 20050616; HK 1028114 A1 20040709; JP 2001522468 A 20011113; JP 4384268 B2 20091216; US 6213635 B1 20010410; WO 9944104 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120226

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090227

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090226

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090227

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090226

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080206

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234239 T3

2005-04-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921914 P 20041223

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030417

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MONTRES RADO S.A.

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI