Global Patent Index - EP 0980577 A1

EP 0980577 A1 2000-02-23 - SWITCHING ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

SWITCHING ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG VON SCHALTERN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE COMMUTATEURS

Publication

EP 0980577 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933440 A

Priority

  • DE 9801235 W
  • DE 19719245 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817369A1] A switch arrangement comprises a housing (2) containing at least one switch element (11) with at least one actuator (5) on the housing, and an elastic seal (18) between the switch and the actuator. The actuator acts on the switch through the seal. The housing has a carrier section with a holder for the actuator. The holder (15) has an opening (17) associated with the switch, and the sealing element is a twin component member moulded onto the carrier. The seal preferably made from an elastic plastics, e.g. polybutylene terephthalate. The housing is preferably made from a hard plastic, e.g. polyacrylate, polyamide, etc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/12 (2006.01); H01H 13/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4293 (2013.01); D06F 39/12 (2013.01); H01H 13/70 (2013.01); D06F 2216/00 (2013.01); H01H 2011/065 (2013.01); H01H 2215/004 (2013.01); H01H 2217/022 (2013.01); H01H 2219/062 (2013.01); H01H 2219/064 (2013.01); H01H 2221/044 (2013.01); H01H 2223/002 (2013.01); H01H 2229/022 (2013.01); H01H 2229/042 (2013.01); H01H 2229/046 (2013.01); H01H 2231/012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850930A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817369 A1 19981112; EP 0980577 A1 20000223; EP 0980577 B1 20020306; US 6204459 B1 20010320; WO 9850930 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803282

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140604

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090506

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090505

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803282 20020411

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2002-03-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990619

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE