Global Patent Index - EP 0980578 A1

EP 0980578 A1 2000-02-23 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES RELAIS

Title (fr)

RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0980578 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922703 A

Priority

  • DE 19718986 A
  • EP 9802166 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850932A1] The relay has a T-shaped core (2) and a U-shaped armature (3) which is arranged with its crossbar (32) on the open end section (24) of the longitudinal limb (21) of the core and which forms two parallel work air gaps with the open ends (34) of its longitudinal arms (31) in relation to the cross-limbs (22) of said core. As a result, a particularly simple assembly and a work air gap with large pole surfaces can be obtained from only a few, simple parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/24 (2006.01); H01H 50/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850932A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850932 A1 19981112; AT 204097 T 20010815; BR 9809235 A 20000627; BR 9809235 B1 20120207; CA 2288775 A1 19981112; CA 2288775 C 20051220; CN 1129935 C 20031203; CN 1255232 A 20000531; EP 0980578 A1 20000223; EP 0980578 B1 20010808; ES 2162446 T3 20011216; ID 22892 A 19991216; JP 2001523380 A 20011120; JP 3957769 B2 20070815; PT 980578 E 20011130; TW 396357 B 20000701; US 6144270 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: PESTALOZZISTRASSE 2 POSTFACH 1416, 8201 SCHAFFHAUSEN (CH)

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2162446 T3

2001-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-10-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801176 20010913

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2001-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 204097 T 20010815

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS AUSTRIA GMBH

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS GMBH

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT