Global Patent Index - EP 0980579 A1

EP 0980579 A1 2000-02-23 - RELAY WITH CONTACT SPRINGS

Title (en)

RELAY WITH CONTACT SPRINGS

Title (de)

RELAIS MIT KONTAKTFEDERN

Title (fr)

RELAIS A BANCS DE CONTACT

Publication

EP 0980579 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925482 A

Priority

  • DE 19718985 A
  • DE 19804572 A
  • EP 9802439 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850933A1] The invention relates to a relay comprising a base body (1), an electromagnet system with a coil (1,10), a core (2) and an armature (3), in addition to a contact arrangement with at least one fixed contact spring (5,9) and at least one moveable contact spring (6). Each contact spring is configured as a flat sheet-metal section and secured to the base body on approximately the same plane without any permanent bending. Contact occurs through overlapping L-shaped end sections. Pretension is produced for each contact spring by means of stops (18,20) on the base body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/54; H01H 50/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/44 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01); H01H 50/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/54 (2013.01); H01H 50/641 (2013.01); H01H 2050/446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850933A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850933 A1 19981112; AT 204098 T 20010815; BR 9809230 A 20000627; BR 9809230 B1 20090505; CA 2288827 A1 19981112; CA 2288827 C 20070306; CN 1133190 C 20031231; CN 1255233 A 20000531; DE 19804572 A1 19990812; EP 0980579 A1 20000223; EP 0980579 B1 20010808; ES 2161056 T3 20011116; ID 22751 A 19991209; JP 2001523381 A 20011120; JP 3976795 B2 20070919; PT 980579 E 20011130; TW 430838 B 20010421; US 6323747 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160405

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160401

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-12-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: PESTALOZZISTRASSE 2 POSTFACH 1416, 8201 SCHAFFHAUSEN (CH)

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2161056

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-10-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-13

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2001-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 204098

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS AUSTRIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT