Global patent index - EP 0980652 A1

EP 0980652 A1 2000-02-23 - West

Title (en)

West

Title (de)

Weste

Title (fr)

Gilet

Publication

EP 0980652 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810690 A

Priority

CH 169298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CH689712A5] A hunting jacket comprises a removable multi-purpose pocket (2) attached to the back, a fixing member (7) for transporting materials, and an inner warming pocket (9) over the kidney area.

Abstract (de)

Ein Jagd-, Fischer- oder Wandergilet (11) ist mit einer Innentasche (41) zur Aufnahme von Wärmespendern und/oder einer abnehmbaren Aussentasche (19) im Nierenbereich des Giletträgers ausgerüstet. Am rückwärtigen Schulterbereich des Rückenteils (13) des Gilets (11) sind bei beiden Schultern Befestigungsschlaufen (25) angeordnet, an denen mit Riemen ein zusätzliches Kleidungsstück befestigt werden kann. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

CH 689712 A5 19990915; EP 0980652 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020718

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE IT LI

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI