Global patent index - EP 0980655 A2

EP 0980655 A2 2000-02-23 - Improved high heel footwear structure

Title (en)

Improved high heel footwear structure

Title (de)

Verbesserter Aufbau für einen Schuh-Absatz

Title (fr)

Structure améliorée pour un talon haut de chaussure

Publication

EP 0980655 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99112605 A

Priority

MX 9805361 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention refers to high heel footwear structure with multiple projections or studs (25). The heel provides more stability when walking and it allows to maintain an appropriate posture. It allows the user to increase the heel height with more stability. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 21/24; A43B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 21/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 21/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980655 A2 20000223; EP 0980655 A3 20000301

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030201

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-12-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI