Global patent index - EP 0980656 A1

EP 0980656 A1 2000-02-23 - Bottle rack

Title (en)

Bottle rack

Title (de)

Flaschenregal

Title (fr)

Rayonnage à bouteilles

Publication

EP 0980656 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116243 A

Priority

AT 54098 U

Abstract (en)

The bottle rack is a grid formed by rectangular plates (1) connected at their adjoining corners through connectors. The plates are made from cork and have along their narrow sides (2) bending-resistant inserts (5) formed as metal rods with angled ends.

Abstract (de)

Flaschenregal in Form eines von im wesentlichen rechteckigen Platten gebildeten Gitters, wobei die verschiedenen Platten (1) an ihren benachbarten Eckpunkten durch Verbindungselemente (3) verbunden sind, welche gegeneinander um 90° versetzte Ausnehmungen (4) aufweisen, welche den Rand der Platten (1) umfassen. Die Platten (1) bestehen aus Kork und weisen entlang der Schmalseiten biegesteife Einlagen auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 73/00; A47B 47/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01); A47B 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 73/006 (2013.01); A47B 47/0033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980656 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030403

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT ES PT

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES PT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI