Global Patent Index - EP 0980657 A2

EP 0980657 A2 2000-02-23 - Transportable combination furniture for the houshold, especially the kitchen or bathroom

Title (en)

Transportable combination furniture for the houshold, especially the kitchen or bathroom

Title (de)

Fahrbares Kombinationsmöbelstück für den Haushaltsbereich, insbesondere für Küche oder Bad

Title (fr)

Meuble combiné pour la maison, en particulier la cuisine ou la salle de bain

Publication

EP 0980657 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115930 A

Priority

DE 29814727 U

Abstract (en)

Metal housing (3) is fastened to a metal base frame (1), with base plate (4) and top plate with several intermediate shelves and equipped with rollers (2), of a mobile piece of furniture for use in kitchen or bathroom and adapted to the height of kitchen units or washbasins. Shelves are fastened to four vertical metal angle sections. Base plate is larger than the shelves and has slots for attachment of the outer housing shell, which projects above the top plate to form a rim (10). Openings are provided in the shell for drawers (11, 12, 13, 14). A vertical column (15) at the front of the housing covers the seam joining the sheet forming the shell and projects at least half the housing height upwards, mounting a rotatable intermediate piece (16). The housing includes a handle (17).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein fahrbares Kombinationsmöbelstück für den Haushaltsbereich, insbesondere für Küche oder Bad, das im wesentlichen aus Metall besteht. Ausgehend von den Nachteilen des bekannten Standes der Technik soll ein Kombinationsmöbelstück geschaffen werden, das zur Aufbewahrung von Arbeitsmitteln und Gebrauchsgegenständen dient, als mobiler Arbeitsplatz einsetzbar ist und von einer Person problemlos an den gewünschten Ort bewegt werden kann und mit einer Vielzahl an Funktionselementen ausrüstbar ist. Hierzu wird vorgeschlagen, daß an dem Grundgestell 1 ein metallisches Gehäuse 3, 34 befestigt ist, das in seiner Höhe an die Höhe von Küchenarbeitsplatten oder Waschtischen angepaßt ist und aus einer Bodenplatte 4, einer Deckplatte 5 und einer oder mehreren Zwischenplatten 6 besteht, die an vier senkrecht, umfangseitig angeordneten metallischen Winkelprofilelementen 7 befestigt sind, wobei die Bodenplatte 4 in ihrem Aulenumfang größer als die anderen Platten 5, 6 ist und parallel zum Außenumfang angeordnete Schlitze 8 zur Fixierung eines die äußere Gehäusehülle bildenden vorgefertigten Blechmantels 9 aufweist, der im montierten Zustand an den umlaufenden Stirnkanten der Deck- und Zwischenplatten 5, 6 anliegt und die Deckplatte 5 überragt An dem Grundgestell 1 ist eine mehrteilige senkrechte Säule 15 gegenüberliegend zur Vorderfront befestigt, die entweder an dem Gehäusemantel 9 anliegend oder geringfügig beabstandet zu diesem angeordnet ist und die Verbindungsnaht des Blechmantels 9 überdeckt und in ihrer Höhe mindestens das Gehäuse 3, 34 um die Hälfte der Gehäusehöhe überragt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 77/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/00 (2006.01); A47B 77/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/04 (2013.01); A47B 49/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814727 U1 19981210; EP 0980657 A2 20000223; EP 0980657 A3 20011017

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47B 77/04 A, 7A 47B 49/00 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI