Global patent index - EP 0980659 A1

EP 0980659 A1 2000-02-23 - Level adjusting device for a foot support and support itself

Title (en)

Level adjusting device for a foot support and support itself

Title (de)

Höheneinstellungsvorrichtung für einen Fussträger und den Träger selbst

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage de niveau d'un support à pieds et ledit support

Publication

EP 0980659 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440226 A

Priority

FR 9810563 A

Abstract (en)

The display shelf foot comprises a threaded rod (11) and an adjusting nut (13). One end of the rod is integral with the support foot (4). The other end is free to slide in a sheath provided on the foot. The level of the support can be simply adjusted by screwing or unscrewing the nut to disengage a greater or lesser length of the rod from the sheath.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif de réglage de niveau permettant une mise à niveau très précise d'un support, tel qu'un présentoir de vente de végétaux, par une seule personne et sans utiliser d'outil, même lorsque le support est mobile et chargé au maximum. Ledit dispositif comprend une tige filetée (11) et un écrou de réglage (13), une extrémité de la tige filetée (11) étant solidaire du support (1), l'autre étant libre de coulisser dans un fourreau prévu sur le pied (4). Le niveau du support (1) peut être réglé simplement et d'une manière continue en vissant ou en dévissant l'écrou de réglage (13) de sorte qu'une plus ou moins grande longueur de tige filetée (11) est dégagée du fourreau (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 91/02; A01G 9/02; A47F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01G 9/02 (2006.01); A47B 91/02 (2006.01); A47F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 91/028 (2013.01); A47F 7/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980659 A1 20000223; FR 2782548 A1 20000225; FR 2782548 B1 20001006

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020424

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000513

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI