Global Patent Index - EP 0980660 A1

EP 0980660 A1 2000-02-23 - Children's bed with a canopy

Title (en)

Children's bed with a canopy

Title (de)

Kinderbett mit Himmel

Title (fr)

Lit d'enfant avec baldaquin

Publication

EP 0980660 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113101 A

Priority

DE 29814959 U

Abstract (en)

The child's cot, with an overhead canopy, has poles (14) which can be fitted as free standing and/or attached to the bed frame. A centre pole (15), aligned to the sides (13), supports the canopy at a given height over the bed frame (10). The poles (14) are U-shaped, as seen on the longitudinal sides of the bed frame (10), to be fitted with feet (16) at the bottom.

Abstract (de)

Ein Kinderbett, welches aus zwei Seitenteilen, einem Kopfteil, einem Fußteil und mit einem aus Stoff hergestellten Himmel besteht, soll so gestaltet werden, daß der Himmel in vielfältiger Weise nach den Wünschen der Benutzer gestaltet werden kann, und daß er in einfachster Weise vom Kinderbett entfernt werden kann. Erfindungsgemäß wird am Bettgestell ein Ständer angebracht, der auch frei aufgestellt werden kann und eine Mittelstange aufweist, die in Richtung der Seitenteile (13) verläuft und in einem vorbestimmten Abstand zum Bettgestell steht. Der Ständer (14) ist als U-förmgier Bügel ausgebildet und die unteren freien Enden der vertikalen Holme sind mit Füßen (16) ausgestattet. Der Ständer bietet eine Vielzahl von Gestaltungsmöglichkeiten für den Himmel. Dieser kann sich an einer Seite über die gesamte Länge des Bettgestells erstrecken und an der anderen Seite kann eine Öffnung verbleiben. Zum Schutz gegen Insekten kann erjedoch auch rundum verlaufen. Das erfindungsgemäße Kinderbett ist besonders für Kleinkinder geeignet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 29/00; A47D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 29/00 (2006.01); A47D 7/00 (2006.01); A47D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 29/00 (2013.01); A47D 7/00 (2013.01); A47D 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814959 U1 19981015; EP 0980660 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020715

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI