Global patent index - EP 0980667 A2

EP 0980667 A2 2000-02-23 - A mop

Title (en)

A mop

Title (de)

Mop

Title (fr)

Balai à franges

Publication

EP 0980667 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305846 A

Priority

GB 9816037 A

Abstract (en)

A mop comprises an elongate handle 10, a tubular (hand grippable sleeve) 11 slidably mounted to the lower end of the handle 10 and an elongate cleaning head 12 rotatably mounted to the lower end of the sleeve 11 for rotation about an axis at an angle of about 40 DEG to the longitudinal axis of the handle 10. The cleaning head 12 is provided on its underside with a cleaning pad 13 having a substantially flat cleaning surface which lies in a plane normal to the axis of rotation of the cleaning head 12. In use, the cleaning head 12 is arranged with its longitudinal axis lying perpendicular to the to-and-fro direction of movement of the mop. However, in order to clean in confined spaces, the cleaning head 12 can be rotated through 90 DEG , so that its longitudinal axis now extends in line with the normal direction of movement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/146 (2006.01); A47L 13/24 (2006.01); A47L 13/258 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/258 (2013.01); A47L 13/146 (2013.01); A47L 13/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980667 A2 20000223; EP 0980667 A3 20020102; GB 9816037 D0 19980923

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061107

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47L 13/20 A, 7A 47L 13/146 B, 7A 47L 13/258 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI