Global Patent Index - EP 0980668 A2

EP 0980668 A2 2000-02-23 - Method for dispensing a fluid, method for generating foam and systems to carry out said methods

Title (en)

Method for dispensing a fluid, method for generating foam and systems to carry out said methods

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Flüssigkeitsabgabe, Verfahren zur Schaumerzeugung und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour délivrer un liquide, méthode pour générer de la mousse et dispositif mettant en oeuvre une telle méthode

Publication

EP 0980668 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202659 A

Priority

NL 1009889 A

Abstract (en)

Method of dispensing a fluid, such as foam, wherein from two spaced locations respective interdirected fluid jets, particularly foam jets, are generated to make a combined fluid jet, particularly a cone or fan shaped fluid jet, and wherein the fluid is preferably a highly concentrated detergent with one or more substances. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/16 (2006.01); A47L 15/24 (2006.01); A47L 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/241 (2013.01); A47L 15/0055 (2013.01); A47L 15/4278 (2013.01); A47L 15/4282 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980668 A2 20000223; EP 0980668 A3 20020522

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 15/00 A, 7B 05D 1/02 B, 7A 47L 15/44 B, 7B 05B 1/02 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI