Global Patent Index - EP 0980669 A2

EP 0980669 A2 2000-02-23 - Dishwasher

Title (en)

Dishwasher

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 0980669 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112992 A

Priority

DE 19836739 A

Abstract (en)

A dish-washing machine where the goods to be rinsed are handled in one or more handling zones following after one another has at least one water spray device (9) in at least one handling zone, at least one collecting tank (17) for rinsing water in the handling zone(s) and below the spray device, connected to a drain (23) and a level boundary for the rinsing water. It has a supply line (21) from the collecting tank to the spray device in which a circulating pump is located. There is a centrifugal force separator (20) to which rinsing water from the collecting tank is passed via a supply line and a circulating pump and where mostly clean water led into the handling zone above the collecting tank and dirty water led into the drain are separated. The clean water from the centrifugal separator (20) is supplied as rinsing water directly to the water spray device (9) for the goods to be cleaned.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Geschirrspülmaschine mit einer Auffangeinrichtung (17) für Spülwasser und einer Ablaßinrichtung (23) sowie einem Fliehkraft-Abscheider (20) für das Spülwasser. Zur Erhöhung der Reinigungswirkung und dadurch zur Verringerung des Reinigungsmittelbedarfes wird das aus dem Fliehkraft-Abscheider nach oben geführte Sauberwasser unmittelbar der Wasser-Sprüheinrichtung einer Behandlungszone (2) zugeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/24 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/247 (2013.01); A47L 15/4219 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19836739 A1 20000217; DE 59914788 D1 20080731; EP 0980669 A2 20000223; EP 0980669 A3 20000329; EP 0980669 B1 20080618

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59914788

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914788

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2012-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914788

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

2009-05-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090319

2008-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914788 P 20080731

2008-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070323

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI