Global Patent Index - EP 0980687 A1

EP 0980687 A1 2000-02-23 - Portable automatic syringe driver

Title (en)

Portable automatic syringe driver

Title (de)

Tragbare automatische Spritzenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pousse seringue portatif

Publication

EP 0980687 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98115744 A

Priority

EP 98115744 A

Abstract (en)

A portable automatic syringe device having a configuration including a separable rotating shaft adapted to provide a drive force to a piston included in the automatic syringe device so that the rotating shaft can be separated, along with the piston, from a housing of the syringe device upon re-filling a syringe of the syringe device with a liquid medicine. A coupling member is coupled between the rotating shaft and power transmission means. The coupling member has a reduction gear engaging with an output gear of the power transmission means, and a cross groove. A horizontal engaging pin is fixed to a lower end of the rotating shaft in such a fashion that it is engaged in the cross groove when the rotating shaft is positioned in position in the syringe device, thereby causing the rotating shaft to be coupled to the coupling member. An injection needle unit is also provided which includes an "L" shaped injection needle member provided with a curved portion capable of absorbing impact, thereby preventing a breakage of the injection needle member. The injection needle unit also includes a sensor for sensing an abnormal blood sugar level generated due to an abnormal injection of a liquid medicine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/145 (2006.01); A61M 5/158 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/14546 (2013.01); A61M 5/158 (2013.01); A61M 5/1456 (2013.01); A61M 2005/1581 (2013.01); A61M 2230/201 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980687 A1 20000223; EP 0980687 B1 20040303; DE 69822145 D1 20040408; DE 69822145 T2 20041028; DK 0980687 T3 20040705; DK 1166808 T3 20040705; EP 1157712 A2 20011128; EP 1157712 A3 20020410; EP 1166808 A2 20020102; EP 1166808 A3 20020410; EP 1166808 B1 20040303

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822145 P 20040408

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PORTABLE AUTOMATIC SYRINGE DEVICE

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980820

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI