Global patent index - EP 0980703 A1

EP 0980703 A1 2000-02-23 - Static mixer

Title (en)

Static mixer

Title (de)

Statischer Mischer

Title (fr)

Mélangeur statique

Publication

EP 0980703 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115110 A

Priority

DE 19837671 A

Abstract (en)

The frames (501 - 504 and 511 - 514) are drawn through at crossing points (320) of the heat carrier channels (580, 581, 590, 591,592). The static mixer insert comprises two or more neighboring layers and parallel frames. The frames of each neighboring layer are crossed by frames. The frames are connected to each other at the crossing points

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein heizbarer oder kühlbarer statischer Mischereinsatz (8; 10) und ein statischer Mischer (11, 8; 10) mit wenigstens einem Mischereinsatz (8; 10) beschrieben, in dem der Mischereinsatz (8; 10) wenigstens aus zwei oder mehreren nebeneinander angeordneten Lagen (a); (b) von insbesondere zu einander parallelen Stegen (501, 502, 503, 504) und (511, 512, 513, 514) besteht, wobei sich die Stege jeweils benachbarter Lagen (a); (b) von Stegen (501, 502, 503, 504) bzw. (511, 512, 513, 514) kreuzen und die Stege (501, 502, 503, 504) und (511, 512, 513, 514) an den Kreuzungsstellen (320) miteinander verbunden sind und in dem die Steglagen (a); (b) an den Kreuzungsstellen (320) von Wärmeträgerkanälen (580, 581, 590, 591, 592) durchzogen sind. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/06; B01F 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 15/06 (2006.01); F28D 7/00 (2006.01); F28F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/0058 (2013.01); B01F 5/0619 (2013.01); B01F 15/066 (2013.01); F28F 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980703 A1 20000223; EP 0980703 B1 20030514; CA 2280469 A1 20000220; CA 2280469 C 20061024; DE 19837671 A1 20000224; JP 2000135424 A 20000516; JP 4074413 B2 20080409; US 6412975 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140809

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905535

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140809

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140809

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59905535

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130808

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130807

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130807

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59905535

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130226

2013-02-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BAYER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130109

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905535

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI