Global Patent Index - EP 0980713 A1

EP 0980713 A1 2000-02-23 - Process and apparatus for the electrostatic separation of a fractionated product

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the electrostatic separation of a fractionated product

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur elektrostatischerTrennung eines Bruchgutes

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour séparer électrostatiquement un produit fractionné

Publication

EP 0980713 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121511 A

Priority

DE 19837635 A

Abstract (en)

The mixture of beans and broken shells (5) is moistened and fed into a hopper (4) and the a vibrating conveyor (6) having positively charged and earthed electrodes (7,8) before falling through an electric field between further electrodes (9,10). The moisture absorbent shell particles (16) are not electrically charged and fall freely into a one part of a receptacle (13), whilst the charged beans (15) are deflected into another part of the receptacle, separated by a wall (12).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren sowie eine Vorrichtung zum Trennen eines Bruchgutes, bestehend aus gebrochenen Körnern oder Bohnen und ihren Schalen, insbesondere zur Trennung von Kakaobruch (Nibs) von Kakaobohnenschalen, wobei die Trennung elektrostatisch erfolgt, indem das Bruchgut in franktionierter Form in einer Aufladungszone (1) zwischen zwei unterschiedlich geladenen Elektroden (7,8) elektrisch aufgeladen, anschließend im frein Fall in einem von zwei anderen, die Freifallstrecke begrenzenden Elektroden (9,10) erzeugten homogenen elektrischen Feld entladen und danach mittels eines mechanischen Separators (12) in zwei getrennten Produktströmen, bestehend im wesentlichen aus einem Kernbruchstrom und einem Schalenstrom, weggefördert wird. Durch unterschiedlich starke Ablenkung der Bruchgutteilchen in der Ablenkzone wird der Kernbruch von den Schalen getrennt, wodurch mit einem relativ geringen apparatetechnischen Aufwand Trennergebnisse erzielbar sind, die bisher nur mit Hilfe von Sieb- und Windsichtvorrichtungen und damit kostspieligeren Apparaten erreicht wurden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980713 A1 20000223; EP 0980713 B1 20030102; AT 230307 T 20030115; DE 19912462 A1 20000224; DK 0980713 T3 20030331; ES 2190031 T3 20030716; JP 2000061359 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: F.B. *LEHMANN MASCHINENFABRIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051130

2007-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051114

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051113

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051114

2005-11-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051113

2005-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051113

2005-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051113

2004-11-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041116

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041104

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041101

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190031 T3

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABATRON-PATENTBUERO AG

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230307 T 20030115

2002-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011022

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI