Global Patent Index - EP 0980718 A3

EP 0980718 A3 2001-01-31 - Screening machine, in particular tumbling screen

Title (en)

Screening machine, in particular tumbling screen

Title (de)

Siebmaschine, insbesondere Taumelsiebmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil à tamiser, en particulier tamis à vacillement

Publication

EP 0980718 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111411 A

Priority

DE 19837466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19837466C1] In the separation of granular material into three fractions, sensors are placed in the outlet ducts of the coarse and medium fractions to monitor flow rates and to alert personnel when these fall outside a set range. The sensors also activate diversion mechanisms, in particular when metal particles from broken screens could contaminate the product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/28 (2006.01); B07B 1/42 (2006.01); B07B 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 13/18 (2013.01); B07B 1/288 (2013.01); B07B 1/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837466 C1 19991111; EP 0980718 A2 20000223; EP 0980718 A3 20010131; EP 0980718 B1 20040317

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110923

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2005-07-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALLGAIER WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908853 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2004-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-09-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WOBLING SCREENING MACHINE

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLGAIER WERKE GMBH

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLGAIER-WERKE GMBH

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI