Global Patent Index - EP 0980727 A2

EP 0980727 A2 2000-02-23 - Device connected to a crank for moving a part mounted on a slider relative thereto

Title (en)

Device connected to a crank for moving a part mounted on a slider relative thereto

Title (de)

Einrichtung an einer Schubkurbel, zum Erzeugen einer Bewegung eines am Schieber gelagerten Teiles relativ zu diesem

Title (fr)

Dispositif associé à un vilebrequin pour générer le mouvement d' une part montée sur un coulisseau, la part pouvant mouvoir par rapport à ce coulisseau

Publication

EP 0980727 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114317 A

Priority

DE 19837756 A

Abstract (en)

The device generates a movement of a pulley (38) etc. held on the slide, relative to the slide. To generate a rotary movement of the pulley on the slide (12), a drive rod (26,28) carries a transmission of rotating parts, e.g. pulley (22,34,38), plates, and belt. The transmission has a driving gear rim fixed to a crank journal, and a driven gear rim, fitted to the revolute joint pivot (18), which connects slide and drive rod. It also has a rotating part connecting both gear rims. The device is used for moving a ram (62) to and fro, relative to a moving slide.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einer Einrichtung an einer Schubkurbel, zum Erzeugen einer Bewegung eines am Schieber gelagerten Teiles relativ zu diesem, welche von dem Kurbelzapfen-Umlauf um die Kurbelwellenachse abgeleitet und entlang der Schubstange auf das zwangsweise bewegbare Teil übertragen wird, statt dessen oszillierender Bewegung eine Drehbewegung desselben (38;100;148) zu erhalten, wird vorgeschlagen, zum Erzeugen einer Drehbewegung jenes Teiles (Rad 38; Scheibe 100; 148) am Schieber (Schlitten 12;124) eine Transmission aus umlaufenden Teilen (Rad 22,34,38; Scheibe 98,100, Riemen 102; Scheibe 142,148, Riemen 150) an der Schubstange (26,28;144) vorzusehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19521041 A1 19961212 - WENGENROTH VOLKER DIPL ING [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980727 A2 20000223; EP 0980727 A3 20000621; EP 0980727 B1 20011031; DE 19837756 C1 20000406; DK 0980727 T3 20011217

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050721

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-08-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2004-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900372 20011206

2001-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2001-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000815

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 13/14 A, 7B 30B 15/32 B, 7F 16H 21/18 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI