Global Patent Index - EP 0980730 A1

EP 0980730 A1 2000-02-23 - Process for producing shaped articles from thixotropic metal alloys

Title (en)

Process for producing shaped articles from thixotropic metal alloys

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus thixotropen Metall-Legierungen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de pièces façonnées à partir d'alliages métalliques à l'état thixotropique

Publication

EP 0980730 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113827 A

Priority

DE 19836883 A

Abstract (en)

Continuously cast billets are converted into rolled plate material. Blanks with a volume and a configuration approaching those of the proposed shaped components are produced from such a plate. Heated to a temperature at which thixotropic state sets in, the blanks are provided with their final shape by press forging, with the liquid constituent of the material solidifying at the same time.

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus thixotropen Metall-Legierungen wird die in die thixotrope Struktur umgeschmolzene Legierung im Stranggießverfahren zu einem Stranggußprofil und das Stranggußprofil zu plattenförmigem Walzgut geformt. Aus dem Walzgut werden Rohlinge mit einer Konfiguration und einem Volumen ausgestanzt, die nahe demjenigen des Formteile liegen. Der einzelne Rohling wird nach Aufwärmen auf eine Temperatur, bei der der Festkörperanteil in der schmelzflüssigen Phase wenigstens 40% bis über 60% liegt, durch Preßschmieden in einer Form zum Formteil umgeformt wird, wobei gleichzeitig der Schmelzeanteil erstarrt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 18/02; B21J 5/00; B22D 17/00; B22D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 18/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/007 (2013.01); B22D 18/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19836883 A1 20000217; EP 0980730 A1 20000223; JP 2000071054 A 20000307; KR 20000017300 A 20000325

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030417

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHULER SMG GMBH & CO. KG

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI