Global patent index - EP 0980741 A1

EP 0980741 A1 2000-02-23 - Method and apparatus for abrasive slurry distribution in mechanical polishing of substrate

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for abrasive slurry distribution in mechanical polishing of substrate

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Abgabe von Poliermittel -Aufschlämmung im mechanischen Polieren von Substraten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de distribution de suspension abrasive pour le polissage mécanique de substrat

Publication

EP 0980741 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401715 A

Priority

FR 9810508 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus for distribution of abrasive suspension or slurry comprises a reservoir (1) in a recirculation contour (40) with pumps (5,6) and a filter (8), and a flow control system including a pressure sensor (80) and a proportional integral-differential (PID) block (81) electrically connected to pumps. The apparatus also includes a refilling reservoir (42), a reservoir (44) for an inert gas under pressure as e.g. nitrogen (N2) of high purity, and valves (70,71,72) in lines to user terminals. The flow velocity in the distribution system is within the limits 0.2-10 m/s, preferably 0.5-2 m/s or 1-1.2 m/s. The two pumps (5,6) are connected in parallel, each operating at 50 % of power with possibility of 100 % in the case of breakdown of one pump. The distribution system also contains the means for vaporization of deionized water in gas under pressure to prevent blockage of filters. In another embodiment, the apparatus comprises two reservoirs for abrasive suspension connected in parallel, and a control system with the pressure sensor, the PID block, and additional controlled valves and level sensors.

Abstract (fr)

Appareil de distribution de suspensions abrasives comportant: un réservoir (1) contenant une suspension abrasive (2), une boucle de distribution (3,7,9,40) de la suspension abrasive (2) reliée au réservoir (1), des moyens de circulation (5,6) pour faire circuler la suspension abrasive (2) à boucle et assurer son retour dans le réservoir (1), des moyens de récupération (1) pour récupérer la suspension abrasive (2) après circulation dans la boucle, des moyens de régulation (81) des moyens de circulation de manière à maintenir une circulation continue de la suspension (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 37/04; B24B 57/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 57/00 (2006.01); B24B 37/04 (2012.01); B24B 57/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 57/02 (2013.01); B24B 37/04 (2013.01); Y10T 137/4673 (2015.04); Y10T 137/469 (2015.04); Y10T 137/4807 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980741 A1 20000223; EP 0980741 B1 20021113; CN 1139106 C 20040218; CN 1247381 A 20000315; DE 69903893 D1 20021219; DE 69903893 T2 20031009; FR 2782506 A1 20000225; FR 2782506 B1 20000922; JP 2000071173 A 20000307; JP 4970635 B2 20120711; KR 100601812 B1 20060719; KR 20000017362 A 20000325; SG 75972 A1 20001024; TW 411289 B 20001111; US 6125876 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100708

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100708

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69903893

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100708

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903893

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010710

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI