Global Patent Index - EP 0980791 B1

EP 0980791 B1 2002-09-18 - Fitting arrangement for a display device

Title (en)

Fitting arrangement for a display device

Title (de)

Einbaukonstruktion für ein Anzeigegerät

Title (fr)

Montage pour l'encastrement d'un dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 0980791 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250200 A

Priority

DE 29815265 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0980791A1] The construction comprises a dish (1) holding the appliance behind the wall section of the cabin. A steel frame (6) is provided between the inner side of the wall and the base of the tray for attaching an elastic plastics frame (7). The plastics frame has a plastics holder rail for holding a protective glass (5) on the front of the appliance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 11/02; B61D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 49/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815265 U1 19990923; DK 0980791 T3 20030120; EP 0980791 A1 20000223; EP 0980791 B1 20020918; ES 2182456 T3 20030301

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902721

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120830

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090620

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090619

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090620

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090620

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090619

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090619

2010-02-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2006-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182456 T3

2003-01-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902721 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI