Global Patent Index - EP 0980809 A1

EP 0980809 A1 2000-02-23 - Safety device for railway points

Title (en)

Safety device for railway points

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung an Schienenweichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour aiguillages de rails

Publication

EP 0980809 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116123 A

Priority

DE 19837860 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19837860C1] The railway points have fixed rails (1,2) and movable points rails (3,4). There are security plates (16-18) with their upper surfaces in the same plane as the rail top surfaces. The plates, at least in the area between the points rails, are arranged on the outer side of the fixed rail (2) and between the inner side of the fixed rail and the opposing points rail (4).

Abstract (de)

Die Schutzvorrichtung für Schienenweichen sieht vor, im kritischen Bereich der Weichen Schutzplatten (16, 17, 18) vorzusehen, deren Oberfläche auf Höhe der Fahreberie der Schiene liegt und auf denen die Spurkränze entgleister Radsätze (R2) laufen. Letztere können damit nicht an der "falschen" Schiene "einfädeln" und werden in der jeweils gewünschten Fahrtrichtung über die Weiche geschleppt, ohne daß nennenswerte Querkräfte entstehen. Auch bietet die Schutzvorrichtung Schutz gegen herabhängende Teile, ein ungewolltes Verstellen der Weiche oder deren Beschädigung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61K 5/06; E01B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 5/06 (2006.01); E01B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 5/06 (2013.01); E01B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19837860 C1 20000105; EP 0980809 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHROEDER, KASPAR

2003-12-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHROEDER, KASPAR

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI