Global patent index - EP 0980829 A1

EP 0980829 A1 2000-02-23 - Method and apparatus for continuously forming, filling and sealing packages while linked together

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for continuously forming, filling and sealing packages while linked together

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Herstellen, Füllen and Siegeln von miteinander verbundenen Packungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareillage pour former, remplir et sceller de manière continue des emballages tout en les maintenant reliés l'un à l'autre

Publication

EP 0980829 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97870185 A

Priority

EP 97870185 A

Abstract (en)

A method of continuously forming, filling and sealing of packages with a continuous web (14) of polyethylene film material includes the steps of folding the web (14) to provide confronting sides (20) joined along a bottom edge (22) and sealing by training the web (14) onto a vertical seal former (34) having plurality of vertical sealers (40) and progressively forming each vertical seal (46) as the web (14) is being continuously moved with the vertical sealer (40) while at the same applying a low temperature sealing action to allow the area of the film being sealed to be progressively melted. This process forms a series of horizontally disposed pouches (48) severed by the vertical seals (46) extending transversely of the web (14) leaving sealed side edges (50) of each pouch (48) partially severed from one another with upper portions (52) of each pouch (48) also remaining connected with adjoining pouches (48) and having opposed sidewalls (54) of each pouch (48) unsealed along a top edge (56) preparatory to filling. A packaging apparatus 10 is also provided for continuously forming filled and sealed packages (12), each having an expanded bottom end (142) capable of receiving a greater amount of fill. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/08; B31B 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 27/00 (2006.01); B65B 9/087 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/087 (2013.01); B31B 2219/028 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980829 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI