Global Patent Index - EP 0980833 A1

EP 0980833 A1 2000-02-23 - Closure for a container

Title (en)

Closure for a container

Title (de)

Verschluss für Behälter

Title (fr)

Fermeture pour recipient

Publication

EP 0980833 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99306558 A

Priority

GB 9817986 A

Abstract (en)

A closure for a container, e.g. a paint or varnish tin, has an annular base (10) defining an aperture (14) and a lid (22) which is releasably securable on the base to close the aperture. Either the lid (22) or the base (10) has an annular projection (24) which is sealingly received in an annular recess (18') in the other of the lid and base. The profiles of the annular projection (24) and the annular recess (18') differ from one another such that when the lid (22) is secured on the base (10) there is noncontinuous contact between the projection (24) and the recess (18'). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/0216 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00092 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00435 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00462 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980833 A1 20000223; GB 9817986 D0 19981014

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI