Global Patent Index - EP 0980839 A3

EP 0980839 A3 2000-10-18 - Feeding device

Title (en)

Feeding device

Title (de)

Zuführvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation

Publication

EP 0980839 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114294 A

Priority

GB 9818113 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0980839A2] A signature (10), or sheet feed, consists a rotating drum (14) which grips the signature by vacuum to remove it from a bottomless holder (12), and by movement in direction (B) carries it to conveyor (38) onto which it drops when released by drum. The signatures are supported by a battery of driven rollers (22) moving linearly with the drum. The holder may be vertical. The conveyor is a saddle chain, but may be a pocket feeder or a flat back conveyor. An Independent claim is included for the method for feeding flat products, such as sheets or signatures from a pile of flat products to a transport device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/10; B65H 3/06; B65H 3/08; B65H 5/10; B65H 5/12; B65H 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 3/08 (2006.01); B65H 3/10 (2006.01); B65H 5/10 (2006.01); B65H 5/12 (2006.01); B65H 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/305 (2013.01); B65H 3/0653 (2013.01); B65H 3/085 (2013.01); B65H 3/10 (2013.01); B65H 5/10 (2013.01); B65H 5/12 (2013.01); B65H 2406/33 (2013.01); B65H 2406/3314 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980839 A2 20000223; EP 0980839 A3 20001018; GB 2340825 A 20000301; GB 9818113 D0 19981014

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 3/10 A, 7B 65H 3/06 B, 7B 65H 3/08 B, 7B 65H 5/10 B, 7B 65H 5/12 B, 7B 65H 5/30 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI