Global Patent Index - EP 0980878 A1

EP 0980878 A1 2000-02-23 - Molecular weight regulation of cis-1,4-polybutadiene using carboxylates

Title (en)

Molecular weight regulation of cis-1,4-polybutadiene using carboxylates

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kontrolle des Molekulargewichts von cis-1,4-Polybutadien unter Verwendung von Carboxylaten

Title (fr)

Procédé de régulation du poids moléculaire de cis-1,4-polybutadiène en utilisant des carboxylates

Publication

EP 0980878 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99115187 A

Priority

US 13658398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5955553A] There is disclosed a process for the regulation of the molecular weight of high cis polybutadiene prepared by polymerizing butadiene under solution polymerization conditions employing as the catalyst system a mixture of (a) organoaluminum compounds; (b) organonickel compounds; and (c) fluorine containing compounds; said polymerization being conducted in the presence of alkali or alkaline earth metal salts of organic carboxylic acids.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 136/06; C08F 2/38; C08F 4/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 2/06 (2006.01); C08F 2/38 (2006.01); C08F 4/70 (2006.01); C08F 136/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 136/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08F 136/06 + C08F 4/7098

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0093075 A1 19831102 - GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5955553 A 19990921; DE 69914984 D1 20040401; DE 69914984 T2 20041209; EP 0980878 A1 20000223; EP 0980878 B1 20040225; ES 2216388 T3 20041016; JP 2000063409 A 20000229; JP 4251416 B2 20090408

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69914984

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRIDGESTONE CORP., TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69914984

- Effective date: 20140828

2014-10-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69914984

- Representative's name: KRAUS & WEISERT PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140828

2014-08-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69914984

- Representative's name: KRAUS & WEISERT PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080816

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080816

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080816

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060817

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070813

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060817

2005-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050826

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216388 T3

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914984 P 20040401

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020725

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI