Global Patent Index - EP 0980920 A1

EP 0980920 A1 2000-02-23 - Device for sensing snapped thread of a divided thread warper having a yarn tension controller and a divided thread guider

Title (en)

Device for sensing snapped thread of a divided thread warper having a yarn tension controller and a divided thread guider

Title (de)

Fadenwächter für eine Mehrfachfadenschärmaschine mit einer Vorrichtung zur Teilung des Fadens, einer Fadenspannungssteuervorrichtung , sowie einem Teilfadenführer

Title (fr)

Dispositif casse-fil dans un ourdissoir pour fils multiples comprenant un dispositif diviseur de fil, un dispositif de réglage de la tension des fils, et un guide pour fil divisé

Publication

EP 0980920 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98115326 A

Priority

EP 98115326 A

Abstract (en)

Provided with a device for sensing a snapped thread which includes a device for controlling yarn tension of a divided thread warper for providing an appropriate tension before and after dividing threads, and a device for guiding the divided thread of a divided thread warper for sensing immediately a fact that some pieces of the divided threads are snapped off and stopping the operations of a yarn feeding section(20) and a winding section(40), thereby making the division of threads without difficulties and preventing potential defects that may occur during a process for weaving the wound threads. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 3/00; D02H 13/04; D02H 13/16; D02H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/00 (2006.01); D02H 13/00 (2006.01); D02H 13/04 (2006.01); D02H 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 13/04 (2013.01); D02H 3/00 (2013.01); D02H 13/00 (2013.01); D02H 13/02 (2013.01); D02H 13/16 (2013.01); D02H 13/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980920 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020806

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI