Global patent index - EP 0980925 A1

EP 0980925 A1 2000-02-23 - Device for weft-insertion in linear shed multiphase looms and linear shed multiphase looms with such device

Title (en)

Device for weft-insertion in linear shed multiphase looms and linear shed multiphase looms with such device

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Eintragen von Schussfäden für eine Reihenfachwebmaschine und Reihenfachwebmaschine mit einer Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'insertion de trame dans un métier à tisser multiphasé à foule linéaire et métier à tisser multiphasé à foule linéaire avec ce dispositif

Publication

EP 0980925 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810620 A

Priority

  • EP 99810620 A
  • EP 98810807 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism for the insertion of weft yarns into a rolling shed loom has a fixed unit (4) with a number of channels and jets (31) to feed the weft yarns (3). A second unit (5), rotating with the loom rotor, has a number of injector jets (12), to take the wefts (3) from the feed channels and propel them into the shed. The jets (31) at the static unit (4) take the weft yarn (3) continuously or intermittently from a supply bobbin, to charge the feed channels. The fixed section (4) has a holder (21) and an assembly (22) of channels in a curve, concentric at the holder. Compartment units form the channels. Each channel can have a transport channel and an extraction channel, where the transport channel has a clear width which is larger than that of the extraction channel. The channels can be assembled into a component, where each channel has a separate inlet and opens into a common outlet. The component has a number of units, where the first unit has the channels, which open into the second unit fitted with one opening. The channels can be divided into groups, with at least one group in the channel component. The channels have a cross section which tapers to the open longitudinal side. The second unit can be fitted with an auxiliary jet, aligned at the opening. The injector jets (12) are at equal angular intervals, on a common circle (24).

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung enthält eine ortsfest angeordnete Einheit (4), die eine Anordnung (22) mit einer Mehrzahl von Kanälen (26) und einer Mehrzahl von Düsen (31) zum Zuführen von Schussfäden (3) aufweist und eine mit dem Webrotor (1) rotierende Einheit (5) mit einer Mehrzahl von Injektordüsen (12), die dazu bestimmt sind, die den Kanälen zugeführten Schussfäden nacheinander abzuziehen und in das Webfach einzuspeisen. Diese Vorrichtung gewährleistet das Eintragen von Schussfäden unterschiedlicher Art und Ausführung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 41/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0433216 A1 19910619 - SULZER AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980925 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030617

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE IT

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULZER TEXTIL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI