Global Patent Index - EP 0980928 A2

EP 0980928 A2 2000-02-23 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIZING A FIBRE BUNDLE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIZING A FIBRE BUNDLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHLICHTEN EINER FADENSCHAR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ENCOLLAGE D'UNE PORTEE DE FILS

Publication

EP 0980928 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116079 A

Priority

DE 19837572 A

Abstract (en)

To control the pressure of a mangle, using two mangle rollers (1,2), the gap (11) between the roller axes (13,14) is adjusted immediately to alter the pressure without hysterisis and in the event of an emergency stoppage. The gap (11) between the roller axes (13,14) is measured by a path movement monitor or increments of the rotations of a lifting spindle (12) or the like. The gap (11) between the roller axes (13,14) is set by mechanical lifting gearing or a threaded spindle (12).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Steuern des Anpreßdrucks der um ihre Achsen rotierbaren Walzen eines Quetschwerks beschrieben. Um eine hysteresefreie und im Fall eines Not-Stopps praktisch augenblickliche Änderung des Anpreßdrucks zu erreichen, wird dieser unmittelbar durch Einstellen des Achsabstands der Walzen gesteuert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 15/02; B30B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 3/18 (2006.01); D06B 15/02 (2006.01); D06B 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 15/02 (2013.01); D06B 3/18 (2013.01); D06B 23/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980928 A2 20000223; EP 0980928 A3 20000823; EP 0980928 B1 20040728; DE 19837572 A1 20000302; ES 2226250 T3 20050316

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050909

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060818

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060817

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060818

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060817

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-09-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050909

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050825

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.#BLUMENBERGER STRASSE 143-145#41061 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2226250 T3

2005-01-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2004-12-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041108

2004-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910047 P 20040902

2004-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIZING A FIBRE BUNDLE

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030409

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI