Global patent index - EP 0980930 A1

EP 0980930 A1 2000-02-23 - Process for dyeing of textile materials with indigo using the indoxyle and installation for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Process for dyeing of textile materials with indigo using the indoxyle and installation for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Färbeverfahren für Textilmaterialien mit Indigo unter Benützung des Indoxyls und Vorrichtung zum Ausführen des Färbeverfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de teinture d'une matière textile avec de l'indigo en utilisant de l'indoxyle et installation pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0980930 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98630046 A

Priority

EP 98630046 A

Abstract (en)

Process for dyeing a textile fabric with indigo comprises passing the fabric through a series of 8 baths of indoxyl solution and, between each bath, oxidizing the indoxyl to indigo by exposing the fabric leaving bath n to air for a time equal to n times x, where x is the exposure time after bath 1. Process for dyeing a textile fabric with indigo comprises: (a) prewashing the fabric by passing it though one or two baths of prewash solution; (b) dyeing the fabric by passing it through a series of 8 baths of indoxyl solution and, between each bath, oxidizing the indoxyl to indigo by exposing the fabric leaving bath n to air for a time equal to n times x, where x is the exposure time after bath 1; (c) washing the fabric by passing it through a water bath, three acetic acid baths and a final water bath with a pH of 6-7, and then predrying the fabric by passing it between rollers; (d) fixing the indigo dye by passing the fabric through a bath containing a mixture of resins to form a transparent film on the fabric fibers; (e) drying the fabric on a series of rollers and winding it onto a drum. An Independent claim is also included for an installation for carrying out the process, comprising a prewashing unit, a dyeing unit, a washing and predrying unit, a fixing unit and a drying unit.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de teinture d'une matière textile avec de l'indigo en utilisant de l'indoxyle comprenant les étapes de: a. prélaver un fil F en le faisant passer au travers d'une installation de prélavage (1) constituée par deux ou plusieurs cuves (2) contenant une solution de prélavage (10,15); b. teinter ensuite le fil en le faisant passer au travers d'une installation de teinture (30) constituée par une série de huit cuves (35) contenant chacune une solution d'indoxyle, et lors du passage d'une cuve (35) à l'autre, le fil subit une oxydation par exposition à l'air transformant l'indoxyle en indigo lequel teinte alors le fil par imprégnation, l'oxydation par exposition à l'air étant réalisée de telle façon que, en passant successivement de la première cuve (35) à la huitième, si on donne la valeur x à l'oxydation entre la première cuve (35) et la deuxième, on aura successivement: Entre les 1° et 2° cuves la valeur d'oxydation = x, Entre les 2° et 3° cuves la valeur d'oxydation = 2x, Entre les 3° et 4° cuves la valeur d'oxydation = 3x, Entre les 4° et 5° cuves la valeur d'oxydation = 4x, Entre les 5° et 6° cuves la valeur d'oxydation = 5x, Entre les 6° et 7° cuves la valeur d'oxydation = 6x, Entre les 7° et 8° cuves la valeur d'oxydation = 7x, Après la 8° cuve valeur d'oxydation = 8x; c. laver et préessuyer le fil en le faisant passer au travers d'une installation de lavage et de préessuyage (40) comprenant une série de cuves (41, 42, 43, 44 et 45), la première cuve (41) contenant de l'eau, les cuves (42, 43 et 44) contenant de l'acide acétique et la cuve (45) contenant de l'eau de telle sorte que le pH dans la dernière cuve, sera entre 6 et 7, et à la sortie de la cuve (45), on préessuie le fil en le faisant passer entre les rouleaux (50); d. encoller la teinture d'indigo sur le fil en le faisant passer au travers d'une installation d'encollage (60) comprenant une cuve (62) contenant un mélange de résines pour former un film transparent sur les fibres du fil; e. sécher le fil en le faisant passer au travers d'une installation de séchage (70) constituée par des rouleaux (71); f. recueillir le fil de chaîne en l'enroulant sur le tambour (72).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 1/22; D06B 3/10; D06B 21/00; D06M 15/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09B 7/00 (2006.01); D06B 3/10 (2006.01); D06B 3/12 (2006.01); D06B 21/00 (2006.01); D06M 15/19 (2006.01); D06P 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/22 (2013.01); D06B 3/12 (2013.01); D06B 21/00 (2013.01); D06P 1/002 (2013.01); D06P 1/0032 (2013.01); D06P 1/5235 (2013.01); D06P 1/525 (2013.01); D06P 1/5278 (2013.01); D06P 1/5285 (2013.01); D06P 1/5292 (2013.01); D06P 1/6533 (2013.01); D06P 1/667 (2013.01); Y10S 8/918 (2013.01); Y10S 8/931 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980930 A1 20000223; EP 0980930 B1 20050126; AT 287984 T 20050215; DE 69828781 D1 20050303; DE 69828781 T2 20051222; DK 0980930 T3 20050530; ES 2235306 T3 20050701; PT 980930 E 20050630; SI 0980930 T1 20051031; US 6090166 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-09 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2014-07-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MA03

- Ref Document Number: 287984

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131014

2014-05-07 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20131014

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090819

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090819

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20100419

2010-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-05-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-04-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-03-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTLA

- Effective date: 20090818

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *GIRBAUD FRANCOIS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BACHELLERIE MARIE-THERESE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-02-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2009-08-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20051025

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2005-12-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20051025

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2235306

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-05-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-05-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-20 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20050400836

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69828781

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040116

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000422;LT PAYMENT 20000422;LV PAYMENT 20000422;MK PAYMENT 20000422;RO PAYMENT 20000422;SI PAYMENT 20000422

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000422

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI