Global Patent Index - EP 0980936 A2

EP 0980936 A2 2000-02-23 - Reinforcing cage and its arrangement for the building of floors with hollow form units

Title (en)

Reinforcing cage and its arrangement for the building of floors with hollow form units

Title (de)

Bewehrungskorb und dessen Anordnung für die Herstellung von Stahlbeton-Hohlkörperplatten

Title (fr)

Cage d'armature et son agencement pour la réalisation de dalles avec corps creux

Publication

EP 0980936 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115571 A

Priority

DE 19837077 A

Abstract (en)

The round steel bent upper ring (20) and the lower ring (18) are fixed to one another coaxially and spaced apart by means of upright braces. The upper ring is reinforced by diagonal horizontal braces. In the reinforcement basket (10) a downwardly open, peripherally closed container (22) can be suspended, the ceiling wall (24) of which has ventilating holes (26). The container in the reinforcement basket is held at least approximately coaxially and the peripheral wall (28) of the container has at least approximately the same horizontal distances from the upright braces of the reinforcement basket. The basket is assembled from a number of U-stirrups (12) which cross one another in the yoke centre. They have teh same angle distances and their legs (14) represent the upright braces.

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung einer Hohlkörper-Stahlbetondecke wird der Deckenbereich mit Bewehrungskörben (10) belegt, die je drei U-Bügel (12) aus Rundstahl im Winkelabstand aufweisen, welche mit zwei Horizontalringen (18, 20) zu einem stabilen, begehbaren Körper verschweißt sind. In diesem Bewehrungskorb (10) wird ein unten offener Behälter (22) eingehängt, dessen Deckwand (24) Entlüftungslöcher (26) aufweist. Der Behälter (22) wird dadurch auftriebsfrei. Bewehrungskörbe (10) und Behälter (22) sind jeweils ineinander stapelbar und bilden Pyramidenstümpfe mit Sechseckbasis. Die Bewehrungskörbe (10) können mit geringen Abständen positioniert werden. Sie sind begehbar und wirken als Abstandshalter für die obere Bewehrung der Betondecke. Nach dem Verfüllen mit Beton ergibt sich eine Hohlkörper-Stahlbetondecke oder -platte in Wabenstruktur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/32; E04B 5/43; E04C 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/43 (2006.01); E04B 5/19 (2006.01); E04B 5/32 (2006.01); E04C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/326 (2013.01); E04B 5/328 (2013.01); E04C 5/203 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8813325 U1 19881215

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6205737 B1 20010327; AT 263875 T 20040415; AU 4347999 A 20000309; AU 745428 B2 20020321; CA 2280427 A1 20000217; DE 19837077 A1 20000224; EP 0980936 A2 20000223; EP 0980936 A3 20000802; EP 0980936 B1 20040407; ES 2221273 T3 20041216; JP 2000154608 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAM A.G.

- Effective date: 20040831

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050808

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050806

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2005-08-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050806

2005-08-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050806

2005-08-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050806

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2005-03-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAM A.G.

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221273 T3

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040826

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-08-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, VON REVY & PARTNER

2004-08-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040813

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-07-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-07-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909092 P 20040513

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2004-04-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040407

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAM AG

2001-04-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 5/32 A, 7E 04B 5/43 B, 7E 04C 5/20 B, 7E 04C 5/18 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI