Global Patent Index - EP 0980937 A2

EP 0980937 A2 2000-02-23 - Panels

Title (en)

Panels

Title (de)

Paneele

Title (fr)

Panneaux

Publication

EP 0980937 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99122668 A

Priority

  • EP 96935072 A
  • GB 9521713 A
  • GB 9525470 A
  • GB 9602598 W

Abstract (en)

A panel comprises a pair of facing sheets and a core which comprises an open cell honeycomb structure filled with foam and having walls which extend between the facing sheets and the foam filling. The walls of the honeycomb structure bridge the space defined between the two facing sheets. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/36; E04C 2/292

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2006.01); E04C 2/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2013.01); E04C 2/365 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 2744042 A 19560501 - PACE HENRY A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715736 A1 19970501; AT 195781 T 20000915; AU 7316796 A 19970515; DE 69609981 D1 20000928; DE 69609981 T2 20010301; EP 0857244 A1 19980812; EP 0857244 B1 20000823; EP 0980937 A2 20000223; EP 0980937 A3 20000315; ES 2152046 T3 20010116; GB 2321482 A 19980729; GB 2321482 B 20000329; GB 9808413 D0 19980617

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021223

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 857244

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE