Global patent index - EP 0980937 A3

EP 0980937 A3 2000-03-15 - Panels

Title (en)

Panels

Title (de)

Paneele

Title (fr)

Panneaux

Publication

EP 0980937 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99122668 A

Priority

  • EP 96935072 A
  • GB 9521713 A
  • GB 9525470 A
  • GB 9602598 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9715736A1] A building panel (10) comprises a pair of facing sheets (12, 14) and a core (16), the core comprising an open cell structure (22) having walls extending between the facing sheets and a foam filling (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/36; E04C 2/292

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2006.01); E04C 2/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/292 (2013.01); E04C 2/365 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9715736 A1 19970501; AT 195781 T 20000915; AU 7316796 A 19970515; DE 69609981 D1 20000928; DE 69609981 T2 20010301; EP 0857244 A1 19980812; EP 0857244 B1 20000823; EP 0980937 A2 20000223; EP 0980937 A3 20000315; ES 2152046 T3 20010116; GB 2321482 A 19980729; GB 2321482 B 20000329; GB 9808413 D0 19980617

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021223

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 857244

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE